THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:18:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 310
1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 350-0550
Fax: (647) 350-0552

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ERIN TERESA CHAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chan (CPSO#: 93767 )
Business Address: 310-1920 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1H 2V6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 310
1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 350-0550
Fax: (647) 350-0552

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ERIN TERESA CHAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chan (CPSO#: 93767 )
Business Address: 310-1920 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1H 2V6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIN TERESA WHIN YEE CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIN TERESA WHIN YEE CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010