THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:17:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-746-4621
Extension: 6202
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 19 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sylvianne Clement Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Aug 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Clement (CPSO#: 93768 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 945-1458
Business Address: 4289 Innes Rd
Your Health-Votre Santé
Orléans ON K1E 0A8
6133667557

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-746-4621
Extension: 6202
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 19 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sylvianne Clement Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Aug 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Clement (CPSO#: 93768 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 945-1458
Business Address: 4289 Innes Rd
Your Health-Votre Santé
Orléans ON K1E 0A8
6133667557

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SYLVIANNE CLEMENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLEMENT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SYLVIANNE CLEMENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLEMENT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Aug 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010