THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:43:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Church Wellesley Health Centre
491 Church Street, Suite 200
Toronto Ontario M4Y 2C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 463-1500
Fax: (416) 463-6577

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony C.F. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chen (CPSO#: 93777 )
Business Address: Church Wellesley Health Centre
200 - 491 Church Street
Toronto Ontario M4Y 2C6
(416) 463-6929

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Church Wellesley Health Centre
491 Church Street, Suite 200
Toronto Ontario M4Y 2C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 463-1500
Fax: (416) 463-6577

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony C.F. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chen (CPSO#: 93777 )
Business Address: Church Wellesley Health Centre
200 - 491 Church Street
Toronto Ontario M4Y 2C6
(416) 463-6929

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY CHI-FU CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY CHI-FU CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2025
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 27 Jun 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2025

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010