THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:16:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1145 Concession Road
Clinic
Cambridge Ontario N3H 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 792-3448
Fax: (226) 336-2616
Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd.
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: (888) 382-6542
Address: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 19 Oct 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ali (CPSO#: 93779 )
Business Address: 1145 Concession Road
Cambridge Ontario N3H 4L5
(226) 792-3448
Business Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 621-2330

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1145 Concession Road
Clinic
Cambridge Ontario N3H 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 792-3448
Fax: (226) 336-2616
Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd.
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: (888) 382-6542
Address: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 19 Oct 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ali (CPSO#: 93779 )
Business Address: 1145 Concession Road
Cambridge Ontario N3H 4L5
(226) 792-3448
Business Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 621-2330

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RASHAD ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RASHAD ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010