THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:01:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College, Cork, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-631-2020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cieslak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cieslak (CPSO#: 93789 )
Business Address: St.Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
(519) 631-2020 Extn: 4017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: University College, Cork, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-631-2020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cieslak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cieslak (CPSO#: 93789 )
Business Address: St.Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
(519) 631-2020 Extn: 4017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTIN CIESLAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIESLAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTIN CIESLAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIESLAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College, Cork, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010