THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:23:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oncology Clinic
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-336-4103
Fax: 905-336-6492

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 30 Oct 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Kang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kang (CPSO#: 93793 )
Business Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 336-4103

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oncology Clinic
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-336-4103
Fax: 905-336-6492

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 30 Oct 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Kang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kang (CPSO#: 93793 )
Business Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 336-4103

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW KANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW KANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010