THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:42:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sioux Lookout First Nations Health
Primary Health Care Unit
61 Queen Street
PO Box 1300
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 737-1802
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jan 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 07 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Mwamwenda-Heinrich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Mwamwenda-Heinrich (CPSO#: 93797 )
Business Address: Sioux Lookout First Nations Health Authority
Primary Health Care Unit
61 Queen Street PO Box 1300
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B8
(807) 737-1802

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sioux Lookout First Nations Health
Primary Health Care Unit
61 Queen Street
PO Box 1300
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 737-1802
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jan 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 07 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Mwamwenda-Heinrich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Mwamwenda-Heinrich (CPSO#: 93797 )
Business Address: Sioux Lookout First Nations Health Authority
Primary Health Care Unit
61 Queen Street PO Box 1300
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B8
(807) 737-1802

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ESCORT MWAMWENDA-HEINRICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MWAMWENDA-HEINRICH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ESCORT MWAMWENDA-HEINRICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MWAMWENDA-HEINRICH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010