THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:13:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 77 Grenville St.
3rd and 4th floors
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-6060
Fax: (416) 323-6135

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Diana Hsiang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hsiang (CPSO#: 93817 )
Business Address: 77 Grenville Street
3rd and 4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 77 Grenville St.
3rd and 4th floors
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-6060
Fax: (416) 323-6135

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Diana Hsiang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hsiang (CPSO#: 93817 )
Business Address: 77 Grenville Street
3rd and 4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANA HSIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HSIANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANA HSIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HSIANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010