THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:19:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-721-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
Centre
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: 807-684-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Vakani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vakani (CPSO#: 93821 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON K2H 8P4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-721-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
Centre
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: 807-684-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Vakani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vakani (CPSO#: 93821 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON K2H 8P4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMEER VAKANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAKANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMEER VAKANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAKANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010