THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:25:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
KGH
Psychiatry
Burr 4
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135496666
Extension: 6020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniela Volochniouk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Volochniouk (CPSO#: 93872 )
Business Address: 4th Floor
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
(613) 938-4240 Extn: 4628
Business Address: 76 Stuart St
KGH
Inpatient Psychiatry
Burr 4
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
613-548-3232 Extn: 4412

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
KGH
Psychiatry
Burr 4
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135496666
Extension: 6020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniela Volochniouk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Volochniouk (CPSO#: 93872 )
Business Address: 4th Floor
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
(613) 938-4240 Extn: 4628
Business Address: 76 Stuart St
KGH
Inpatient Psychiatry
Burr 4
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
613-548-3232 Extn: 4412

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIELA VOLOCHNIOUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOLOCHNIOUK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIELA VOLOCHNIOUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOLOCHNIOUK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010