THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:52:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 658 Second Line West
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6C 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7054505339
Fax: 7054505359

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: DOCUdavit Solutions
Toll-Free 1-888-781-9083
28 EUGENE ST. NORTH YORK, ON M6B 3Z4
Date Received: 06 Sep 2023

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Russell G. Tull Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tull (CPSO#: 93890 )
Business Address: 3-773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0B7
(705) 450-0702
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Area Hospital
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8
7057593434
Business Address: 658 Second Line West
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6C 2K9
705-450-5339

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 658 Second Line West
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6C 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7054505339
Fax: 7054505359

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: DOCUdavit Solutions
Toll-Free 1-888-781-9083
28 EUGENE ST. NORTH YORK, ON M6B 3Z4
Date Received: 06 Sep 2023

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Russell G. Tull Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tull (CPSO#: 93890 )
Business Address: 3-773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0B7
(705) 450-0702
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Area Hospital
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8
7057593434
Business Address: 658 Second Line West
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6C 2K9
705-450-5339

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUSSELL GREGORY TULL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TULL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUSSELL GREGORY TULL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TULL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2010
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2010