THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 20:27:16 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1036 Princess Street
Maple Family Health Team
Shared Care Psychiatry
D2
Kingston Ontario K7L 1H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-531-5888
Extension: 1107
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-200 Speers Blvd
Loyalist Family Health Team
Department of Shared Care Psychiatry
Amherstview Ontario K7N 1Y7
Phone: 6135070213
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DEBRA HAMER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hamer (CPSO#: 93896 )
Business Address: Maple Family Health Team
1036 Princess Street, Unit D2
Kingston Ontario K7K 6L8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1036 Princess Street
Maple Family Health Team
Shared Care Psychiatry
D2
Kingston Ontario K7L 1H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-531-5888
Extension: 1107
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-200 Speers Blvd
Loyalist Family Health Team
Department of Shared Care Psychiatry
Amherstview Ontario K7N 1Y7
Phone: 6135070213
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DEBRA HAMER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hamer (CPSO#: 93896 )
Business Address: Maple Family Health Team
1036 Princess Street, Unit D2
Kingston Ontario K7K 6L8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBRA MICHELLE HAMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBRA MICHELLE HAMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010