THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:38:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 837-6440
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 40 Finchgate Boulevard
Unit 316
Brampton Ontario L6T 3H9
Phone: 4167842907
Fax: 2897644002
Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 350 Eramosa Road
Guelph Ontario N1E 2M9
Phone: 2268076600
Fax: 2267705338

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anusoumya Ganapathy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Sep 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ganapathy (CPSO#: 93949 )
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1J 4E4
(519) 822-5350
Business Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Address: 40 Finchgate Boulevard
Unit 316
Brampton Ontario L6T 3H9
4167842907
Business Address: 350 Eramosa Road
Guelph Ontario N1E 2M9
2268076600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TAMIL
Medical School: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 837-6440
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 40 Finchgate Boulevard
Unit 316
Brampton Ontario L6T 3H9
Phone: 4167842907
Fax: 2897644002
Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 350 Eramosa Road
Guelph Ontario N1E 2M9
Phone: 2268076600
Fax: 2267705338

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anusoumya Ganapathy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Sep 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ganapathy (CPSO#: 93949 )
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1J 4E4
(519) 822-5350
Business Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Address: 40 Finchgate Boulevard
Unit 316
Brampton Ontario L6T 3H9
4167842907
Business Address: 350 Eramosa Road
Guelph Ontario N1E 2M9
2268076600

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
28 May 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 28 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Anusoumya Ganapathy may practise medicine independently in internal
medicine and critical care medicine, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Anusoumya Ganapathy may practise medicine independently in internal
medicine and critical care medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 May 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 May 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010