THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:43:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LMC Healthcare - London
140 Oxford Street East
Suite 400
London Ontario N6A 5R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-680-0802
Fax: 226-680-0800

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 25 Aug 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 25 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SN Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chaudhry (CPSO#: 93983 )
Business Address: 210 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2A 3Z3
(613) 680-9092
Business Address: 140 Oxford St E
Suite 400
London ON N6A 5R9
226-680-0802

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LMC Healthcare - London
140 Oxford Street East
Suite 400
London Ontario N6A 5R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-680-0802
Fax: 226-680-0800

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 25 Aug 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 25 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SN Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chaudhry (CPSO#: 93983 )
Business Address: 210 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2A 3Z3
(613) 680-9092
Business Address: 140 Oxford St E
Suite 400
London ON N6A 5R9
226-680-0802

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEHLA NAZ CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEHLA NAZ CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010