THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:24:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 268 Grosvenor Street
St Joseph's Hospital
London Ontario N6A 3N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196466100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
St Mary's General hospital
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: 5197443311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Joseph's Hospital
268, Grosvenor St
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
Victoria Hospital, LHSC
London Ontario N6A5W9
Phone: (519) 685 8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 189 Elm Street
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
St. Thomas Ontario N5R 1J3
Phone: 5196312030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pain Medicine
Effective: 25 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pain Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 25 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manikandan Rajarathinam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rajarathinam (CPSO#: 94009 )
Business Address: LHSC - University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Room C3-125
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
5197494300
Business Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TAMIL
Medical School: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 268 Grosvenor Street
St Joseph's Hospital
London Ontario N6A 3N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196466100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
St Mary's General hospital
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: 5197443311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Joseph's Hospital
268, Grosvenor St
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
Victoria Hospital, LHSC
London Ontario N6A5W9
Phone: (519) 685 8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 189 Elm Street
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
St. Thomas Ontario N5R 1J3
Phone: 5196312030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pain Medicine
Effective: 25 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pain Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 25 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manikandan Rajarathinam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rajarathinam (CPSO#: 94009 )
Business Address: LHSC - University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Room C3-125
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
5197494300
Business Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 Aug 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 25 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MANIKANDAN RAJARATHINAM may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology and pain medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MANIKANDAN RAJARATHINAM may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology and pain medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Aug 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010