THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:00:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond Street
Room 17013
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168643082
Fax: 4168645480

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jan 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 24 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Douglas Fairgrieve Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Fairgrieve (CPSO#: 94026 )
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Room 17013
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Address: 3rd Floor
100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 274-3562

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond Street
Room 17013
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168643082
Fax: 4168645480

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jan 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 24 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Douglas Fairgrieve Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Fairgrieve (CPSO#: 94026 )
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Room 17013
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Address: 3rd Floor
100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 274-3562

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER DOUGLAS FAIRGRIEVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAIRGRIEVE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER DOUGLAS FAIRGRIEVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAIRGRIEVE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Feb 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010