THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:08:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Wales, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696 7279
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: 613 722 7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gary Small Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Small (CPSO#: 94040 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Wales, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696 7279
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: 613 722 7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gary Small Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Small (CPSO#: 94040 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
04 Jan 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 04 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Gary Robert Small may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Cardiology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Small
holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor,
and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Small no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Gary Robert Small may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Cardiology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Small
holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor,
and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Small no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Wales, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010