THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:36:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Chittagong, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Tillsonburg Medical Centre
200 Broadway
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 5A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 842-4231
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BIKASH CHOWDHURY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chowdhury (CPSO#: 94062 )
Business Address: 438 Eagletrace Drive
London Ontario N6G 0E5
2262682385

Corporation Name: Bikash Chowdhury Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Sep 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI
Medical School: University of Chittagong, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Tillsonburg Medical Centre
200 Broadway
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 5A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 842-4231
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BIKASH CHOWDHURY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chowdhury (CPSO#: 94062 )
Business Address: 438 Eagletrace Drive
London Ontario N6G 0E5
2262682385

Corporation Name: Bikash Chowdhury Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Sep 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BIKASH KANTI CHOWDHURY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOWDHURY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BIKASH KANTI CHOWDHURY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOWDHURY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Chittagong, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010