THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:15:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Pontificia Universidad Cat¢lica de Chile, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Neurology
200 Elizabeth Street. 5EC Room 334
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3957
Fax: 416-340-3297

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 15 Sep 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Chile

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carolina Barnett Tapia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Barnett Tapia (CPSO#: 94087 )
Business Address: UHN General Hospital
Division of Neurology
Eaton Building, 5th Floor, Room 334
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Pontificia Universidad Cat¢lica de Chile, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Neurology
200 Elizabeth Street. 5EC Room 334
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3957
Fax: 416-340-3297

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 15 Sep 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Chile

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carolina Barnett Tapia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Barnett Tapia (CPSO#: 94087 )
Business Address: UHN General Hospital
Division of Neurology
Eaton Building, 5th Floor, Room 334
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Jul 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 15 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. CAROLINA BARNETT TAPIA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Neurology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. BARNETT TAPIA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. BARNETT TAPIA no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. CAROLINA BARNETT TAPIA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Neurology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. BARNETT TAPIA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. BARNETT TAPIA no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Pontificia Universidad Cat¢lica de Chile, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010