THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:44:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 740-6855
Fax: (705) 740-6881

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 28 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Romanowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Romanowski (CPSO#: 94093 )
Business Address: The Peterborough Clinic
202 - 26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
(705) 740-6855

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 740-6855
Fax: (705) 740-6881

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 28 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Romanowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Romanowski (CPSO#: 94093 )
Business Address: The Peterborough Clinic
202 - 26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
(705) 740-6855

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW JOHN ROMANOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROMANOWSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW JOHN ROMANOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROMANOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010