THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/04/25 06:32:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: (888) 900-2760
Address: 5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: (888) 900-2760
Address: 260 Sugarloaf St
Port Colborne Ontario L3K 2N7
Phone: 9053784647
Fax: 8889002760
Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-343
Fax: (888) 900-2760
Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 6P9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: (888) 900-2760

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 21 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amber Graystone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Graystone (CPSO#: 94103 )
Business Address: 230 Bertie Street
Fort Erie Ontario L2A 1Z2
(905) 329-2721
Business Address: 5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Street
St Catharines Ontario L2R 6P9
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
(705) 759-3434
Business Address: 260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne Ontario L3K 2N7
(905) 378-4647

Corporation Name: Van Sittert Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jul 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: (888) 900-2760
Address: 5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: (888) 900-2760
Address: 260 Sugarloaf St
Port Colborne Ontario L3K 2N7
Phone: 9053784647
Fax: 8889002760
Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-343
Fax: (888) 900-2760
Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 6P9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: (888) 900-2760

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 21 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amber Graystone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Graystone (CPSO#: 94103 )
Business Address: 230 Bertie Street
Fort Erie Ontario L2A 1Z2
(905) 329-2721
Business Address: 5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Street
St Catharines Ontario L2R 6P9
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
(705) 759-3434
Business Address: 260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne Ontario L3K 2N7
(905) 378-4647

Corporation Name: Van Sittert Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jul 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMBER GRAYSTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAYSTONE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMBER GRAYSTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAYSTONE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010