THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:02:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network
Department of Paediatrics
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Extension: 7234
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7160 Markham Road
Markham Ontario L3S 3J8
Phone: 9054727400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 520 Ellesmere Road
603
Toronto Ontario M1R 0B1
Phone: 4164461575
Fax: 4164462919

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 26 May 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MUHAMMAD HAMID MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hamid (CPSO#: 94134 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
416-284-8131 Extn: 7013
Business Address: 396 Princess Avenue
396
Toronto Ontario M2N 3S9
6479903132
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Road
603
Toronto Ontario M1R 0B1
4164461575

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network
Department of Paediatrics
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Extension: 7234
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7160 Markham Road
Markham Ontario L3S 3J8
Phone: 9054727400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 520 Ellesmere Road
603
Toronto Ontario M1R 0B1
Phone: 4164461575
Fax: 4164462919

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 26 May 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MUHAMMAD HAMID MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hamid (CPSO#: 94134 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
416-284-8131 Extn: 7013
Business Address: 396 Princess Avenue
396
Toronto Ontario M2N 3S9
6479903132
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Road
603
Toronto Ontario M1R 0B1
4164461575

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 May 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 26 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MUHAMMAD AKHTER HAMID may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MUHAMMAD AKHTER HAMID may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 May 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 May 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2010