THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:45:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Quaid-i-Azam University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 358 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N6A 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 438 0002
Fax: (519) 438 0888
Address: 1340 Huron Street
London Ontario N5V 3R3
Phone: 519-455-3910
Fax: 519-455-1570

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jan 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 14 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aatika Imran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Imran (CPSO#: 94183 )
Business Address: 358 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N6A 1V7
(519) 438-0002

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Quaid-i-Azam University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 358 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N6A 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 438 0002
Fax: (519) 438 0888
Address: 1340 Huron Street
London Ontario N5V 3R3
Phone: 519-455-3910
Fax: 519-455-1570

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jan 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 14 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aatika Imran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Imran (CPSO#: 94183 )
Business Address: 358 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N6A 1V7
(519) 438-0002

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AATIKA IMRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IMRAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AATIKA IMRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IMRAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Quaid-i-Azam University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2010