THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:32:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Oakville Medical
3075 Hospital Gate, Suite 318
Oakville, Ontario
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 338-8303
Fax: (905) 815-9528

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 21 Jul 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 21 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cynthia M. Fiorini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Fiorini (CPSO#: 94199 )
Business Address: 318-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
(905) 338-8303

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Oakville Medical
3075 Hospital Gate, Suite 318
Oakville, Ontario
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 338-8303
Fax: (905) 815-9528

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 21 Jul 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 21 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cynthia M. Fiorini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Fiorini (CPSO#: 94199 )
Business Address: 318-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
(905) 338-8303

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
02 Feb 2012
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 02 2012
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

Dr. Cynthia Marie Fiorini may practise medicine independently in
Paediatrics in an office setting, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

Dr. Cynthia Marie Fiorini may practise medicine independently in
Paediatrics in an office setting, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Feb 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Feb 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2012

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2010