THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:14:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lisboa, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Neurology
Room 2196
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 18986
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Feb 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 01 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Portugal

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tiago A. Mestre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Mestre (CPSO#: 94208 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Neurology
Room 2174
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 18986

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Lisboa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Neurology
Room 2196
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 18986
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Feb 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 01 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Portugal

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tiago A. Mestre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Mestre (CPSO#: 94208 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Neurology
Room 2174
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 18986

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
05 Feb 2024
30 Apr 2029
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 05 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Apr 30 2029
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Tiago Alexandre Mestre may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Neurology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Mestre holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Mestre no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate is issued on February 1, 2014, and expires on April 30, 2029. Upon renewal of Dr. Mestre's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Tiago Alexandre Mestre may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Neurology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Mestre holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Mestre no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate is issued on February 1, 2014, and expires on April 30, 2029. Upon renewal of Dr. Mestre's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lisboa, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Apr 2029
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Jan 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Aug 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Apr 2029

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2010