THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:41:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 900 Purdy's Mill Road
Kingston Ontario K7M 3M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 384 0322
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 12 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hassan (CPSO#: 94215 )
Business Address: 548 Sydney St
Kingston ON K7P 0C9

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Aug 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 900 Purdy's Mill Road
Kingston Ontario K7M 3M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 384 0322
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 12 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hassan (CPSO#: 94215 )
Business Address: 548 Sydney St
Kingston ON K7P 0C9

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Aug 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARIQ MAHMOOD HASSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARIQ MAHMOOD HASSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Aug 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2010