THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:20:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Winchester District Hospital
566 Louise St
Winchester Ontario K0C2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-774-2420
Fax: 613-774-0453
Address: 211 Lake Ave E
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
Phone: 613-257-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
Phone: 613-938-4240
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Kirkland & District Hospital
145 GOVERNMENT RD E
PO BOX 3000 STN MAIN
Kirkland Lake Ontario P2N 3P4
Phone: 7055675251
Fax: 7055682102
Address: 401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Marie-Curie Pvt
suite 300
Ottawa ON K1N 1A2
Phone: 613-564-3950
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 316 Rideau Street
Unit 2
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5Y5
Phone: 6135643950
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: 6137227000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Phone: 6137227000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Phone: 6137227000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Perth & Smiths Falls District Hosp
Great War Memorial - Perth Site
33 DRUMMOND ST W
Perth Ontario K7H2K1
Phone: 6132671500
Fax: 6132640365
Address: Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win
Health Centre
1 Meno Ya Win Way
P O Box 909 Stn Main
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B4
Phone: (807) 737-3030
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hugh Allen Clinic
79 Fifth Avenue N
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1K9
Phone: (807) 737-3803
Fax: (807) 737-1771
Address: Perth & Smiths Falls District Hosp
Smiths Falls Site
60 CORNELIA ST W
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A2H9
Phone: 6132832330
Fax: 6132838990

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre N. Jakubow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jakubow (CPSO#: 94221 )
Business Address: 401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Business Address: 100 Marie-Curie Pvt
suite 300
Ottawa ON K1N 1A2
Business Address: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth Ontario K7H 2K1
(613) 267-1500
Business Address: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
Business Address: Kirkland District Hospital
145 Government Road East
PO Box 3000, Stn Main
Kirkland Lake Ontario P2N 3P4
(705) 567-5251
Business Address: Hugh Allen Clinic
79 Fifth Avenue North
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1A8
(807) 737-3803
Business Address: Winchester District Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 774-2420
Business Address: Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre
1 Meno Ya Win Way
PO Box 909 Stn Main
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B4
(807) 737-3030
Business Address: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2H9
(613) 283-2330
Business Address: 840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Community Hospital
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Winchester District Hospital
566 Louise St
Winchester Ontario K0C2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-774-2420
Fax: 613-774-0453
Address: 211 Lake Ave E
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
Phone: 613-257-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
Phone: 613-938-4240
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Kirkland & District Hospital
145 GOVERNMENT RD E
PO BOX 3000 STN MAIN
Kirkland Lake Ontario P2N 3P4
Phone: 7055675251
Fax: 7055682102
Address: 401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Marie-Curie Pvt
suite 300
Ottawa ON K1N 1A2
Phone: 613-564-3950
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 316 Rideau Street
Unit 2
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5Y5
Phone: 6135643950
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: 6137227000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Phone: 6137227000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Phone: 6137227000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Perth & Smiths Falls District Hosp
Great War Memorial - Perth Site
33 DRUMMOND ST W
Perth Ontario K7H2K1
Phone: 6132671500
Fax: 6132640365
Address: Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win
Health Centre
1 Meno Ya Win Way
P O Box 909 Stn Main
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B4
Phone: (807) 737-3030
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hugh Allen Clinic
79 Fifth Avenue N
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1K9
Phone: (807) 737-3803
Fax: (807) 737-1771
Address: Perth & Smiths Falls District Hosp
Smiths Falls Site
60 CORNELIA ST W
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A2H9
Phone: 6132832330
Fax: 6132838990

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre N. Jakubow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jakubow (CPSO#: 94221 )
Business Address: 401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Business Address: 100 Marie-Curie Pvt
suite 300
Ottawa ON K1N 1A2
Business Address: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth Ontario K7H 2K1
(613) 267-1500
Business Address: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
Business Address: Kirkland District Hospital
145 Government Road East
PO Box 3000, Stn Main
Kirkland Lake Ontario P2N 3P4
(705) 567-5251
Business Address: Hugh Allen Clinic
79 Fifth Avenue North
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1A8
(807) 737-3803
Business Address: Winchester District Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 774-2420
Business Address: Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre
1 Meno Ya Win Way
PO Box 909 Stn Main
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B4
(807) 737-3030
Business Address: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2H9
(613) 283-2330
Business Address: 840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Community Hospital
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRE NICHOLAS JAKUBOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAKUBOW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRE NICHOLAS JAKUBOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAKUBOW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2010