THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:09:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-765 Queen St E
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 2A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 254-4364
Fax: (705) 759-9355
Address: 204-860 Boul. Saint-Rene Ouest
Gatineau Quebec J8T8M1
Phone: 8195256888
Fax: 8195257111

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anis Aziz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Aziz (CPSO#: 94224 )
Business Address: 335 - 955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6A 2C3
(705) 254-4364
Business Address: 202-765 Queen St E
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 2A8
Business Address: 308-201 Deacon St
Pembroke ON K8A 2J6
6137323675 Extn: 6652

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-765 Queen St E
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 2A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 254-4364
Fax: (705) 759-9355
Address: 204-860 Boul. Saint-Rene Ouest
Gatineau Quebec J8T8M1
Phone: 8195256888
Fax: 8195257111

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anis Aziz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Aziz (CPSO#: 94224 )
Business Address: 335 - 955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6A 2C3
(705) 254-4364
Business Address: 202-765 Queen St E
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 2A8
Business Address: 308-201 Deacon St
Pembroke ON K8A 2J6
6137323675 Extn: 6652

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANIS AZIZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZIZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANIS AZIZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZIZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 17 Aug 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 17 Aug 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2010
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2010