THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:15:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 107 Victoria St E
Alliston
Ontario
L9R1G7
Alliston Ontario L9R 1G7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 434-5358
Fax: (705) 415-1190

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MDP Farrugia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Farrugia (CPSO#: 94234 )
Business Address: Windsor Health Centre
Alliston Family Health Team
36 Victoria Street
P.O. Box 280
Alliston Ontario L9R 1S8
(705) 435-8887
Business Address: 107 Victoria St E
Alliston ON L9R 1G7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 107 Victoria St E
Alliston
Ontario
L9R1G7
Alliston Ontario L9R 1G7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 434-5358
Fax: (705) 415-1190

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MDP Farrugia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Farrugia (CPSO#: 94234 )
Business Address: Windsor Health Centre
Alliston Family Health Team
36 Victoria Street
P.O. Box 280
Alliston Ontario L9R 1S8
(705) 435-8887
Business Address: 107 Victoria St E
Alliston ON L9R 1G7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID PATRICK FARRUGIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARRUGIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID PATRICK FARRUGIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARRUGIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2010