THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:59:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Units 301 - 303
505 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3T 7T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 709-8228
Fax: (905) 709-9007
Address: 230 Airport Road
Gander Newfoundland and Labrador A1V 1L7
Phone: (709) 256-2295
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 11 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas Chung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Chung (CPSO#: 94326 )
Business Address: Units 301-303
505 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3T 7T1
(905) 709-8228

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Units 301 - 303
505 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3T 7T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 709-8228
Fax: (905) 709-9007
Address: 230 Airport Road
Gander Newfoundland and Labrador A1V 1L7
Phone: (709) 256-2295
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 11 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas Chung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Chung (CPSO#: 94326 )
Business Address: Units 301-303
505 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3T 7T1
(905) 709-8228

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2010
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2010