THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:39:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: Dosanjh, Sohail (Used Until: 14 Feb 2011)
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Park Family Medicine
10-2710 North Park Dr
Brampton ON L6S 0E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-799-0777
Fax: 905-799-0187

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Oct 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sohail Sunner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sunner (CPSO#: 94357 )
Business Address: Unit 16
2120 North Park Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
(905) 792-0100
Business Address: 2 - 2956 Highway 69N
Val Caron Ontario P3N 1E3
(905) 805-0198
Business Address: 10-2710 North Park Dr
North Park Family Medicine
905-799-0777

General Information

Former Name: Dosanjh, Sohail (Used Until: 14 Feb 2011)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Park Family Medicine
10-2710 North Park Dr
Brampton ON L6S 0E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-799-0777
Fax: 905-799-0187

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Oct 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sohail Sunner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sunner (CPSO#: 94357 )
Business Address: Unit 16
2120 North Park Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
(905) 792-0100
Business Address: 2 - 2956 Highway 69N
Val Caron Ontario P3N 1E3
(905) 805-0198
Business Address: 10-2710 North Park Dr
North Park Family Medicine
905-799-0777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOHAIL SUNNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUNNER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOHAIL SUNNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUNNER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2010
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2010