THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:15:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Cardiology
Suite 18-364
600 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 7613
Fax: (416) 586-4775
Address: 829 St Clair Ave W
Toronto Cardiac Clinic
Toronto ON M6C 1C2
Phone: 416-883-3783
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 55 Town Centre Court
KMH Labs Cardiology
Suite 109
Toronto Ontario M1P 4X4
Phone: 905-855-1860
Fax: No Information Available
Address: MS Cardiology Services
491 Lawrence Avenue West, Suite 500
Toronto, ON, M5M 1C7
Toronto Ontario M5M 1C7
Phone: 416-781-9500
Fax: 416-781-7985
Address: 1805 Queen Street East
East Toronto Vascular Clinic
Toronto Ontario M4L 3Y3
Phone: 6479199493
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 20 Jun 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sean Balmain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Balmain (CPSO#: 94423 )
Business Address: 829 St Clair Ave W
Toronto Cardiac Clinic
Toronto ON M6C 1C2
416-883-3783
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 7613
Business Address: UHN Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Cardiology
Unit 18-364
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 7613
Business Address: MS Cardiology Services
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON M5M 1C7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Cardiology
Suite 18-364
600 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 7613
Fax: (416) 586-4775
Address: 829 St Clair Ave W
Toronto Cardiac Clinic
Toronto ON M6C 1C2
Phone: 416-883-3783
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 55 Town Centre Court
KMH Labs Cardiology
Suite 109
Toronto Ontario M1P 4X4
Phone: 905-855-1860
Fax: No Information Available
Address: MS Cardiology Services
491 Lawrence Avenue West, Suite 500
Toronto, ON, M5M 1C7
Toronto Ontario M5M 1C7
Phone: 416-781-9500
Fax: 416-781-7985
Address: 1805 Queen Street East
East Toronto Vascular Clinic
Toronto Ontario M4L 3Y3
Phone: 6479199493
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 20 Jun 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sean Balmain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Balmain (CPSO#: 94423 )
Business Address: 829 St Clair Ave W
Toronto Cardiac Clinic
Toronto ON M6C 1C2
416-883-3783
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 7613
Business Address: UHN Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Cardiology
Unit 18-364
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 7613
Business Address: MS Cardiology Services
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON M5M 1C7

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Jun 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 20 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sean Balmain may practise medicine independently in cardiology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sean Balmain may practise medicine independently in cardiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2010