THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:48:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Spartan Health Sciences University, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 130 HWY 20 EAST
UNIT A6
Fonthill Ontario L3B 0B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 892-1010
Fax: (905) 892-4004
Address: Niagara Health System
260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne Ontario L3K2N7
Phone: 905-378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jul 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 28 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois
USA - New York
USA - Wisconsin

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Rana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rana (CPSO#: 94440 )
Business Address: Unit A6
130 Hwy 20 East
Fonthill Ontario L3B 0B3
(905) 892-1010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Spartan Health Sciences University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 130 HWY 20 EAST
UNIT A6
Fonthill Ontario L3B 0B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 892-1010
Fax: (905) 892-4004
Address: Niagara Health System
260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne Ontario L3K2N7
Phone: 905-378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jul 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 28 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois
USA - New York
USA - Wisconsin

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Rana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rana (CPSO#: 94440 )
Business Address: Unit A6
130 Hwy 20 East
Fonthill Ontario L3B 0B3
(905) 892-1010

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
11 Sep 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 11 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Shreyas Kanu Rana may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Shreyas Kanu Rana may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Spartan Health Sciences University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Jan 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2010