THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:35:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 105
2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 946-0160
Fax: (519) 258-2169
Address: South West Detention Centre
4819 8th Concession Road RR#3
Maidstone Ontario N0R 1K0
Phone: (519) 967-3100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Ryan Carlini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Carlini (CPSO#: 94473 )
Business Address: 2464 Howard Ave
Suite 105
Windsor ON N8X 3V6
519-946-0160

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 105
2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 946-0160
Fax: (519) 258-2169
Address: South West Detention Centre
4819 8th Concession Road RR#3
Maidstone Ontario N0R 1K0
Phone: (519) 967-3100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Ryan Carlini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Carlini (CPSO#: 94473 )
Business Address: 2464 Howard Ave
Suite 105
Windsor ON N8X 3V6
519-946-0160

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN JOSEPH CARLINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARLINI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN JOSEPH CARLINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARLINI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2010