THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:13:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nottingham, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeshore Medical Group
Suite 502 - 345 Lakeshore Rd E
Oakville Ontario L6J 1J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-4511
Fax: (905) 845-8133

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raj Ruparelia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ruparelia (CPSO#: 94481 )
Business Address: Lakeshore Medical Group
Suite 502
345 Lakeshore Road East
Oakville Ontario L6J 1J5
(905) 845-4511

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nottingham, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeshore Medical Group
Suite 502 - 345 Lakeshore Rd E
Oakville Ontario L6J 1J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-4511
Fax: (905) 845-8133

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raj Ruparelia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ruparelia (CPSO#: 94481 )
Business Address: Lakeshore Medical Group
Suite 502
345 Lakeshore Road East
Oakville Ontario L6J 1J5
(905) 845-4511

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJ RUPARELIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUPARELIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJ RUPARELIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUPARELIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nottingham, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2010