THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:06:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nottingham, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 Barrydowne Road
Sudbury Ontario P3A 3T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 524-7419
Fax: (705) 524-9087
Address: Suite 96
Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3Z4
Phone: (905)707-8181
Fax: (905) 707-8180

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Ka-Ying Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lam (CPSO#: 94495 )
Business Address: 550 Highway 7 East #96
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3Z4
(905) 707-8181
Business Address: 555 Barrydowne Road
Sudbury Ontario P3A 3T4
(705) 524-7419

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Nottingham, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 Barrydowne Road
Sudbury Ontario P3A 3T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 524-7419
Fax: (705) 524-9087
Address: Suite 96
Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3Z4
Phone: (905)707-8181
Fax: (905) 707-8180

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Ka-Ying Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lam (CPSO#: 94495 )
Business Address: 550 Highway 7 East #96
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3Z4
(905) 707-8181
Business Address: 555 Barrydowne Road
Sudbury Ontario P3A 3T4
(705) 524-7419

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER KA-YING LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER KA-YING LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nottingham, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2010