THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:57:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25-16945 Leslie St
Insight Care Health Centre
Newmarket ON L3Y 9A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-836-2223
Fax: 18668451781

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bickhram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bickhram (CPSO#: 94497 )
Business Address: Milton Health Centre
Suite 200
1225 Maple Avenue
Milton Ontario L9T 0A5
(905) 693-6400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25-16945 Leslie St
Insight Care Health Centre
Newmarket ON L3Y 9A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-836-2223
Fax: 18668451781

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bickhram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bickhram (CPSO#: 94497 )
Business Address: Milton Health Centre
Suite 200
1225 Maple Avenue
Milton Ontario L9T 0A5
(905) 693-6400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHENDRA BICKHRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BICKHRAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHENDRA BICKHRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BICKHRAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2010