THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:12:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: State University of Leiden, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DUTCH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2525 Old Bronte road
unit 400
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 825-5999
Fax: (905) 825-8586

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jan 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 21 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Subani Selvarajah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Selvarajah (CPSO#: 94505 )
Business Address: 2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 400
Oakville Ontario L6M 2J2
(905) 825-5999

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DUTCH, TAMIL
Medical School: State University of Leiden, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2525 Old Bronte road
unit 400
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 825-5999
Fax: (905) 825-8586

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jan 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 21 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Subani Selvarajah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Selvarajah (CPSO#: 94505 )
Business Address: 2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 400
Oakville Ontario L6M 2J2
(905) 825-5999

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUBANI SELVARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELVARAJAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUBANI SELVARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELVARAJAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: State University of Leiden, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2010