THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/04/25 18:21:21 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6505 Malden Rd
Windsor ON N9H 1T5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-970-9280
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Dobosz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dobosz (CPSO#: 94518 )
Business Address: 6505 Malden Road
Lasalle ON N9H 1T5
519-970-9280

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6505 Malden Rd
Windsor ON N9H 1T5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-970-9280
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Dobosz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dobosz (CPSO#: 94518 )
Business Address: 6505 Malden Road
Lasalle ON N9H 1T5
519-970-9280

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHERINE DOBOSZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOBOSZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHERINE DOBOSZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOBOSZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2010