THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:15:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 890-151 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M5S 1S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-420-5033
Fax: 647-480-5033

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine Marie Hooper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hooper (CPSO#: 94520 )
Business Address: 200 - 1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1
(905) 844-3281
Business Address: 890-151 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M5S 1S4
647-420-5033

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 890-151 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M5S 1S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-420-5033
Fax: 647-480-5033

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine Marie Hooper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hooper (CPSO#: 94520 )
Business Address: 200 - 1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1
(905) 844-3281
Business Address: 890-151 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M5S 1S4
647-420-5033

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARIE FREEMAN HOOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOOPER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARIE FREEMAN HOOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOOPER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2010