THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:08:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1194 Karn Place
Ottawa ON K1H 7Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-521-0999
Fax: 613-521-0444

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christina N. Gandilo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gandilo (CPSO#: 94562 )
Business Address: 1194 Evans Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7Z4
(613) 521-0999
Business Address: 404 - 1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4G2
(613) 728-1392

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1194 Karn Place
Ottawa ON K1H 7Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-521-0999
Fax: 613-521-0444

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christina N. Gandilo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gandilo (CPSO#: 94562 )
Business Address: 1194 Evans Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7Z4
(613) 521-0999
Business Address: 404 - 1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4G2
(613) 728-1392

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINA NADIA GANDILO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDILO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINA NADIA GANDILO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDILO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2010