THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:17:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 230 Picton Main St
Picton ON K0K 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-476-7870
Fax: 613-476-6482

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Oct 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Noah S. Walman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Walman (CPSO#: 94577 )
Business Address: 230 Picton Main St
Picton ON K0K 2T0
Business Address: 5A-389 Main St
Picton ON K0K 2T0
613-476-7870

Corporation Name: Noah S. Walman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Mar 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 230 Picton Main St
Picton ON K0K 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-476-7870
Fax: 613-476-6482

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Oct 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Noah S. Walman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Walman (CPSO#: 94577 )
Business Address: 230 Picton Main St
Picton ON K0K 2T0
Business Address: 5A-389 Main St
Picton ON K0K 2T0
613-476-7870

Corporation Name: Noah S. Walman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Mar 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOAH SAMUEL WALMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOAH SAMUEL WALMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2010