THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:36:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grantham Medical Clinic
Unit B3
400 Scott Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2M 3W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 937-0000
Fax: (905) 937-0030
Address: 968 Albion Rd
Etobicoke ON M9V 1A7
Phone: 4166138596
Fax: 4165469065

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alnhisi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Alnhisi (CPSO#: 94595 )
Business Address: Grantham Medical Clinic
400 Scott Street
St Catharines Ontario L2M 3W4
(905) 937-0000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grantham Medical Clinic
Unit B3
400 Scott Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2M 3W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 937-0000
Fax: (905) 937-0030
Address: 968 Albion Rd
Etobicoke ON M9V 1A7
Phone: 4166138596
Fax: 4165469065

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alnhisi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Alnhisi (CPSO#: 94595 )
Business Address: Grantham Medical Clinic
400 Scott Street
St Catharines Ontario L2M 3W4
(905) 937-0000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHALED MOHAMED ABOBAKR ALNHISI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALNHISI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHALED MOHAMED ABOBAKR ALNHISI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALNHISI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Apr 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2010