THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:35:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Fundacao Universidade Do Amazonas (UFAM), 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: (905) 381.9365

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: EDWARD PASSOS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Passos (CPSO#: 94609 )
Business Address: 237 Barton St E 9055212100 Extn: 44237

Corporation Name: Edward Passos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH
Medical School: Fundacao Universidade Do Amazonas (UFAM), 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: (905) 381.9365

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: EDWARD PASSOS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Passos (CPSO#: 94609 )
Business Address: 237 Barton St E 9055212100 Extn: 44237

Corporation Name: Edward Passos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD MARTINS PASSOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASSOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD MARTINS PASSOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASSOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Fundacao Universidade Do Amazonas (UFAM), 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2010