THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 05:07:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calcutta, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, TELUGU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: KM Medical Centre
Unit 18, 811 Bovaird Drive West
Brampton Ontario L6X 0T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 455-5252
Fax: (905) 455-2727
Address: Sheridan Doctors Clinic
Suite 6, 373 Steeles Avenue West
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0P8
Phone: 905-452-8881
Fax: 905-452-9997

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Krishna Chakraborty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chakraborty (CPSO#: 94618 )
Business Address: 2262 ManorHill Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5M 5B8
Business Address: Suite 6
373 Steels Avenue West
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0P8
(905) 452-8881
Business Address: Suite 18
811 Bovaird Drive West
Brampton Ontario L6X 0T9
(905) 455-5252

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, TELUGU
Medical School: University of Calcutta, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: KM Medical Centre
Unit 18, 811 Bovaird Drive West
Brampton Ontario L6X 0T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 455-5252
Fax: (905) 455-2727
Address: Sheridan Doctors Clinic
Suite 6, 373 Steeles Avenue West
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0P8
Phone: 905-452-8881
Fax: 905-452-9997

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Krishna Chakraborty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chakraborty (CPSO#: 94618 )
Business Address: 2262 ManorHill Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5M 5B8
Business Address: Suite 6
373 Steels Avenue West
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0P8
(905) 452-8881
Business Address: Suite 18
811 Bovaird Drive West
Brampton Ontario L6X 0T9
(905) 455-5252

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISHNA CHAKRABORTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKRABORTY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISHNA CHAKRABORTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKRABORTY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calcutta, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2010
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2010