THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:24:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tver State Medical Academy, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 500B
18 Kensington Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 201-9000
Fax: (289) 201-9002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Feb 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Dutta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dutta (CPSO#: 94645 )

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Dutta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Tver State Medical Academy, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 500B
18 Kensington Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 201-9000
Fax: (289) 201-9002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Feb 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Dutta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dutta (CPSO#: 94645 )

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Dutta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIDHARTH DUTTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUTTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIDHARTH DUTTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUTTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tver State Medical Academy, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2010
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2010