THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:11:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Perugia, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Crl 140-1280 Main St W
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 585-9140
Extension: 20152
Fax: No Information Available
Address: ATTN dr Alfonso Iorio
Juravinski Thrombosis Clinic
669 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 42640
Fax: (905) 574-7625

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Iorio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Iorio (CPSO#: 94768 )
Business Address: 1280 Main Street West
Suite CRL-140
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 525-9140 Extn: 22421

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Perugia, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Crl 140-1280 Main St W
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 585-9140
Extension: 20152
Fax: No Information Available
Address: ATTN dr Alfonso Iorio
Juravinski Thrombosis Clinic
669 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 42640
Fax: (905) 574-7625

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Iorio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Iorio (CPSO#: 94768 )
Business Address: 1280 Main Street West
Suite CRL-140
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 525-9140 Extn: 22421

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 May 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 16 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ALFONSO IORIO may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ALFONSO IORIO may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Perugia, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 May 2024
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 May 2024

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2011