THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:26:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-7013
Fax: 416-281-7102
Address: Markham Kids Clinic
Unit 306
6633 Highway 7
Markham Ontario L3P 7C2
Phone: 289-554-1762
Fax: 289-554-1765
Address: 3 Strathgowan Avenue
Reset Pediatric Lifestyle Medicine
TH 101
Toronto Ontario M4N 0B4
Phone: 6472279578
Fax: 416-572-8745

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rikin Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Patel (CPSO#: 94781 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-7013
Fax: 416-281-7102
Address: Markham Kids Clinic
Unit 306
6633 Highway 7
Markham Ontario L3P 7C2
Phone: 289-554-1762
Fax: 289-554-1765
Address: 3 Strathgowan Avenue
Reset Pediatric Lifestyle Medicine
TH 101
Toronto Ontario M4N 0B4
Phone: 6472279578
Fax: 416-572-8745

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rikin Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Patel (CPSO#: 94781 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RIKIN KIRANKUMAR PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RIKIN KIRANKUMAR PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Mar 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 May 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2011