THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/04/25 06:01:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Rd
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Pediatric critical care
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brianna McKelvie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. B. McKelvie (CPSO#: 94825 )
Business Address: Pediatric Critical Care Centre
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
C2-841
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 55263
Business Address: 401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
613-737-7600 Extn: 1406
Business Address: 401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
613-986-1101

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Rd
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Pediatric critical care
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brianna McKelvie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. B. McKelvie (CPSO#: 94825 )
Business Address: Pediatric Critical Care Centre
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
C2-841
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 55263
Business Address: 401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
613-737-7600 Extn: 1406
Business Address: 401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
613-986-1101

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIANNA LYNN MCKELVIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKELVIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIANNA LYNN MCKELVIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKELVIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Mar 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2011