THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 03:59:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Shiraz University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
11 Newton Drive
Toronto Ontario M2M 2M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 343-7675
Fax: (647) 343-7674
Address: 267 Finch Ave W
North York ON M2R 1M8
Phone: 647-992-9277
Fax: 416-250-1919
Address: 1001-33 Bloor Street East
Padra Clinic Inc
Toronto Ontario M4W 0A8
Phone: 18886915964
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alireza Oliaei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Oliaei (CPSO#: 94849 )
Business Address: 11 Newton Drive
Toronto Ontario M2M 2M6

Corporation Name: Dr. Alireza Oliaei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 May 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, PERSIAN
Medical School: Shiraz University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
11 Newton Drive
Toronto Ontario M2M 2M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 343-7675
Fax: (647) 343-7674
Address: 267 Finch Ave W
North York ON M2R 1M8
Phone: 647-992-9277
Fax: 416-250-1919
Address: 1001-33 Bloor Street East
Padra Clinic Inc
Toronto Ontario M4W 0A8
Phone: 18886915964
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alireza Oliaei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Oliaei (CPSO#: 94849 )
Business Address: 11 Newton Drive
Toronto Ontario M2M 2M6

Corporation Name: Dr. Alireza Oliaei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 May 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALIREZA OLIAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIAEI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALIREZA OLIAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIAEI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Shiraz University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2011
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2011